HB0330

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

County Boards of Education - Procurements for Construction or Repair of School Projects

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jones

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/27/20161/27/2016First Reading Appropriations
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20162/5/2016Hearing cancelled
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/24/20162/24/2016Hearing cancelled
3/9/20163/9/2016Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.