HB0331 (CH0612)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Open Meetings Act - Violations and Penalties

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20131/24/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/27/20132/27/2013Favorable with Amendments {786285/1 Report Adopted36
Second Reading Passed with Amendments36
3/1/20133/1/2013Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Bobo) Adopted 38
3/5/20133/5/2013Third Reading Passed (125-10)40
Senate3/6/20133/6/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs39
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.