HB0338 (CH0097)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Robbery - Charging Document

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/24/20131/24/2013Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.