HB0352 (CH0261)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits

Sponsored by:

Delegate Ghrist

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/27/20161/27/2016First Reading Appropriations
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/3/20163/3/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/4/20163/4/2016Favorable with Amendments {684767/1 Report Adopted38
Second Reading Passed with Amendments38
3/8/20163/8/2016Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Jones) Adopted40
Recommitted to Appropriations (Delegate Jones)40
3/10/20163/10/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/11/20163/11/2016Favorable with Amendments {244264/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/15/20163/12/2016Third Reading Passed (137-0)44
Senate3/16/20163/16/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation45
3/18/20163/18/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20163/29/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20163/26/2016Favorable with Amendments {539839/1 Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
3/31/20163/27/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)56
House4/7/20164/1/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (131-2)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.