HB0356 (CH0105)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program

Sponsored by:

Chair, Economic Matters Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Economic Matters
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Finance31
3/6/20133/6/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Finance
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
4/2/20133/28/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)59
House4/2/20133/27/2013Returned Passed60A
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.