HB0365

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration

Sponsored by:

Delegate Walker

Status:

In the House - Returned Passed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {865567/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (138-0)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20183/23/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/23/20183/21/2018Favorable with Amendments {589834/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/26/20183/22/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)53
House4/4/20183/26/2018House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments60
House Requests Senate Recede60
Conference Committee Appointed60
Delegates Walker, Buckel, and Ebersole60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Motion Recede (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted61
Committee Amendment {589834/1 Withdrawn62
Senate Recede62
Third Reading Passed (46-0)62
House4/6/20183/28/2018Returned Passed62

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:31 A.M.