HB0366

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Home Act of 2014

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lafferty

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20141/23/2014First Reading Environmental Matters
1/27/20141/27/2014Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
1/28/20141/28/2014Hearing cancelled
2/10/20142/10/2014Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20142/25/2014Hearing cancelled
3/3/20143/3/2014Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 3, 2014 4:23 P.M.