HB0367

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process

Sponsored by:

Delegate Reznik

Status:

In the Senate - Second Reading Passed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20171/25/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {873622/164
Special Order until later today (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted 64
Favorable with Amendments {873622/164
Committee Amendment Adopted (88-49)64
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted64
Floor Amendment {223225/1 (Delegate Hill) Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/7/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed (87-51)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017First Reading Senate Rules62
4/10/20174/10/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/4/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.