HB0382

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court Costs

Sponsored by:

Delegate Niemann

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/24/20131/24/2013Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.