HB0383

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Development and Implementation

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Ways and Means
2/9/20152/9/2015Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20153/12/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/13/20153/13/2015Favorable with Amendments {275760/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/17/20153/14/2015Third Reading Passed (138-2)44
Senate3/18/20153/18/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs45
4/9/20154/9/2015Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:42 P.M.