HB0385 (CH0435)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding Extension

Sponsored by:

Delegate Robinson, S.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable with Amendments {970619/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (110-25)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs35
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.