HB0390 (CH0535)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees

Sponsored by:

Delegate Griffith

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Appropriations
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {444163/2 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation41
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (43-4)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.