HB0410 (CH0129)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority PG/MC 108-18

Sponsored by:

Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
3/1/20183/1/2018Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {990813/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48B
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 1:05 P.M.