HB0413 (CH0400)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Special Education - Individualized Education Program Parental Notice Requirements and Service Models List

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20141/24/2014First Reading Ways and Means
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/3/20143/3/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable with Amendments {925260/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/6/20143/6/2014Third Reading Passed (136-0)42
Senate3/7/20143/7/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs41
3/12/20143/12/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20143/23/2014Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/2/20143/24/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)58
House4/3/20143/27/2014Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.