HB0427 (CH0033)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools – Student Sunscreen Use – Policy

Sponsored by:

Delegate Young, K.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/19/20182/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/20/20182/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {465162/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/22/20182/22/2018Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted32
Floor Amendment {493722/1 (Delegate Healey) Adopted32
Second Reading Passed with Amendments32
2/27/20182/27/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)35
Senate2/28/20182/28/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs36
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.