HB0428 (CH0114)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure to Public Institutions of Higher Education

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly, K.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/22/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {732112/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (131-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.