HB0430 (CH0371)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor Vehicles

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/29/20131/29/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs41
3/11/20133/11/2013Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings42
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.