HB0430

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Student Data Privacy Council

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20161/29/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/3/20162/3/2016Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2/29/20162/29/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/1/20163/1/2016Favorable with Amendments {165260/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
3/3/20163/3/2016Third Reading Passed (139-0)37
Senate3/4/20163/4/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs37
3/7/20163/7/2016Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.