HB0430 (CH0563)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jones

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Appropriations
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {954262/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (100-36)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)58
House4/2/20183/24/2018Returned Passed58
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:37 P.M.