HB0442

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction in Public and Nonpublic High Schools

Sponsored by:

Delegate Queen

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20181/25/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20182/22/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/23/20182/23/2018Favorable with Amendments {915268/1 Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed with Amendments33
2/27/20182/27/2018Third Reading Passed (134-2)35
Senate2/28/20182/28/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs36
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 23, 2018 6:36 P.M.