HB0459 (CH0099)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants

Sponsored by:

Chair, Ways and Means Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/27/20141/27/2014First Reading Ways and Means
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
1/30/20141/30/2014Hearing cancelled
2/12/20142/12/2014Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/10/20143/10/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/11/20143/8/2014Favorable with Amendments {545962/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/12/20143/9/2014Third Reading Passed (135-0)45
Senate3/13/20143/10/2014First Reading Senate Rules44
3/19/20143/20/2014Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/20143/21/2014Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20143/23/2014Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/2/20143/24/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)58
House4/3/20143/27/2014Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/8/20144/8/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:50 P.M.