HB0461

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (More Learning, Less Testing Act of 2017)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Veto sustained (0-140)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20171/26/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/23/20172/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/24/20172/24/2017Favorable with Amendments {545869/1 Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed with Amendments33
2/28/20172/28/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)35
Senate3/1/20173/1/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs34
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {784631/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)62
House4/10/20174/3/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (140-0)68
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
House1/10/20181/10/2018Veto sustained (0-140)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 11, 2018 7:30 A.M.