HB0470

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection

Sponsored by:

Delegate Otto

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable with Amendments {540417/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20133/15/2013Third Reading Passed (137-1)48A
Senate3/19/20133/17/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation48
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.