HB0518 (CH0668)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Health - Prenatal HIV Testing

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/27/20171/27/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/8/20173/8/2017Favorable with Amendments {506889/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)43
Senate3/13/20173/13/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42
3/15/20173/15/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20173/29/2017Favorable with Amendments {244738/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/5/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)59
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (134-0)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:01 P.M.