HB0530 (CH0237)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Backpacks and Bookbags

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, M.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {865865/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46A
3/24/20173/24/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20174/4/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/4/20173/29/2017Favorable with Amendments {839636/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/5/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)59
House4/7/20173/31/2017House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments65
House Requests Senate Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Delegates Ebersole, Walker, and Reilly65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Refuses to Recede62
Conference Committee Appointed62
Senators Eckardt, McFadden, and Currie62
House4/10/20174/3/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted68
Third Reading Passed (141-0)68
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted63A
Third Reading Passed (47-0)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.