HB0532 (CH0855)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Place

Sponsored by:

Delegate Reznik

Status:

Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 855


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20181/26/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/1/20183/1/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/2/20183/2/2018Favorable with Amendments {585467/1 Report Adopted38
Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 38
3/6/20183/6/2018Floor Amendment {273726/1 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (50-84)40
Floor Amendment {883428/1 (Delegate Carr) Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (91-47)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
3/22/20183/22/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/20183/20/2018Favorable51
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 51
3/23/20183/21/2018Favorable Report Adopted52
Floor Amendment {343324/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-34)52
Second Reading Passed52
3/26/20183/22/2018Third Reading Passed (33-14)53
House3/27/20183/20/2018Returned Passed54
Post Passage5/26/20185/26/2018Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 855

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.