HB0580

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/3/20162/3/2016First Reading Economic Matters
2/8/20162/8/2016Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20163/31/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/31/20163/26/2016Favorable with Amendments {233899/1 Report Adopted58
Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 58
4/1/20163/27/2016Floor Committee Amendment {713294/1 Adopted59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Davis) {713723/1 Adopted59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {613426/1 Rejected (53-83)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {973026/1 Rejected (51-83)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {643426/1 Rejected (50-82)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {863928/1 Rejected (52-81)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {783522/1 Rejected (52-81)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {153322/1 Rejected (50-79)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Morgan) {653328/1 Rejected (50-77)59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/4/20163/28/2016Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kipke) Adopted60
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {323925/1 Rejected (51-83)60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/5/20163/29/2016Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted61
Third Reading Passed (84-54)61
Senate4/6/20163/31/2016First Reading Senate Rules60
4/11/20164/11/2016Rereferred to Finance

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:00 P.M.