HB0633 (CH0423)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records

Sponsored by:

Delegate Healey

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {670012/1 Report Adopted40
Floor Amendment {113324/2 (Delegate Wilson) Rejected (66-71)40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings43
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.