HB0642

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Veto sustained (0-141)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/12/20152/12/2015First Reading Ways and Means
2/18/20152/18/2015Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20153/18/2015Favorable with Amendments {445667/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/20/20153/19/2015Third Reading Passed (137-0)49
Senate3/23/20153/20/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
4/9/20154/9/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20154/3/2015Favorable with Amendments {484230/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/11/20154/4/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)62
House4/13/20154/7/2015House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (138-0)68
Passed Enrolled68
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
House1/13/20161/13/2016Veto sustained (0-141)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:43 P.M.