HB0642 (CH0012)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings

Sponsored by:

Delegate Wilson, C.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20172/1/2017First Reading Judiciary
2/2/20172/2/2017Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {252810/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings46A
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/23/20173/21/2017Favorable Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed50
3/24/20173/22/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)51
House3/27/20173/22/2017Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/4/20174/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.