HB0667 (CH0262)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation Fees

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20133/14/2013Favorable with Amendments {545366/1 Report Adopted47
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Ready) Adopted 47
3/18/20133/15/2013Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate Ready) Withdrawn48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Ready) {233024/1 Rejected (42-89)48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Ready) {183920/1 Rejected (40-91)48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {283626/1 Rejected (47-80)48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Hough) {963221/1 Rejected (47-81)48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {693520/148A
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (44-90)48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {903725/1 Rejected (42-91)48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20133/16/2013Third Reading Passed (95-43)49
Senate3/20/20133/18/2013First Reading Finance49
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {947372/159
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 59
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable with Amendments {947372/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13)61
House4/6/20134/1/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (92-35)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.