HB0669 (CH0197)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Electronic Tip Programs

Sponsored by:

Delegate Arentz

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20172/1/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/7/20172/7/2017Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable with Amendments {185067/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)46
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs45
3/20/20173/20/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20173/29/2017Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/5/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/6/20173/30/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.