HB0677 (CH0039)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pena-Melnyk

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/7/20183/7/2018Favorable with Amendments {316183/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (132-4)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018Returned Passed50
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.