HB0679 (CH0035)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pena-Melnyk

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20182/6/2018Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {115060/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted 40
3/7/20183/7/2018Floor Amendment {243627/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (125-12)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {204032/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)58
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (134-4)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.