HB0694 (CH0002)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)

Sponsored by:

Delegate McIntosh

Status:

Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2018


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20172/1/2017First Reading Appropriations
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {704962/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/18/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (94-45)49
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {954738/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-9)62
House4/10/20174/3/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (93-45)68
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House1/10/20181/10/2018Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/11 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
1/11/20181/11/2018Veto overridden (90-50)
Senate1/12/20181/12/2018Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator Reilly) Rejected
Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Veto overridden (32-15)
Post Passage1/12/20181/12/2018Became Law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2018

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 16, 2018 7:58 A.M.