HB0695 (CH0096)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20172/1/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/10/20172/10/2017Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {565969/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)51
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46A
3/24/20173/24/2017Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/3/20173/28/2017Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/4/20173/29/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)58
House4/4/20173/28/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 11, 2017 2:01 P.M.