HB0697 (CH0634)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - Applicability

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20132/4/2013First Reading Judiciary
2/1/20132/1/2013Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable with Amendments {662910/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)50
Senate3/21/20133/19/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings50
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.