HB0698 (CH0475)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {680813/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
3/1/20183/1/2018Third Reading Passed (136-1)37
Senate3/2/20183/2/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs38
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:34 P.M.