HB0708

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Gutierrez

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/9/20164/4/2016Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/11/20164/5/2016Third Reading Passed (135-5)68
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016First Reading Senate Rules65

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:01 P.M.