HB0722 (CH0666)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms - Funding

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Appropriations
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/28/20163/23/2016Favorable with Amendments {414066/155A
Special Order until 3/29 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 55A
3/29/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments {414066/1 Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56
3/30/20163/25/2016Third Reading Passed (114-24)57
Senate3/31/20163/27/2016First Reading Senate Rules56
4/5/20164/6/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/7/20164/1/2016Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/11/20164/3/2016Third Reading Passed (31-14)63A
House4/11/20164/5/2016Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:01 P.M.