HB0723

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform

Sponsored by:

Delegate Queen

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/2/20172/2/2017First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted 40
3/8/20173/8/2017Floor Amendment {683424/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (48-86)41
Second Reading Passed41
3/10/20173/10/2017Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vogt) Adopted43
Third Reading Passed (79-55)43
Senate3/13/20173/13/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings42

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.