HB0786 (CH0583)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Individualized or Group Behavioral Counseling Services - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Angel

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {745265/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/20/20173/16/2017Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted50
Floor Amendment {983327/1 (Delegate Cullison) Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)51
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {534636/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)62
House4/10/20174/3/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (140-0)68
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.