Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session



Visual Impairments - Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kittleman


In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20182/6/2018Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {195769/1 Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment {153827/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)46
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

March 16, 2018 9:26 A.M.