HB0803 (CH0456)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session



Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Legalization

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo


Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/13/20152/13/2015First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20153/16/2015Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
3/17/20153/14/2015Favorable Report Adopted44
Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate McComas) Adopted 44
3/19/20153/17/2015Floor Committee Amendment {120415/1 Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/20/20153/19/2015Third Reading Passed (123-14)49
Senate3/23/20153/20/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
3/24/20153/24/2015Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20154/9/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20154/3/2015Favorable with Amendments {864636/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/13/20154/5/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)63
House4/13/20154/9/2015House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (130-8)70
Passed Enrolled70
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

October 24, 2017 4:44 P.M.