HB0807 (CH0330)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution

Sponsored by:

Delegate Beidle

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {480411/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {659736/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)59
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (137-0)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:57 P.M.