HB0838 (CH0483)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hill

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/13/20152/13/2015First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/17/20152/17/2015Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20153/23/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/23/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments {356085/1 Report Adopted50
Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {613428/1 Rejected (51-86)50
Special Order until next session (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted 50
3/23/20153/21/2015Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/24/20153/22/2015Third Reading Passed (94-44)52
Senate3/25/20153/22/2015First Reading Finance49
3/26/20153/26/2015Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20154/8/2015Favorable Report by Finance
4/8/20154/1/2015Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/9/20154/2/2015Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {823429/160
Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 60
4/10/20154/3/2015Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {823429/1 Rejected (17-23)61
Third Reading Passed (32-14)61
House4/13/20154/7/2015Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/30/20155/30/2015Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:44 P.M.