HB0879 (CH0031)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Integrity Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20172/6/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20173/21/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/21/20173/18/2017Favorable with Amendments {730510/1 Report Adopted52
Floor Amendment {433929/1 (Delegate Szeliga)52
Special Order until 03/22 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 52
3/23/20173/20/2017Floor Amendment {433929/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn54
Floor Amendment {393224/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/24/20173/21/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)55
Senate3/27/20173/23/2017First Reading Senate Rules52
3/29/20173/30/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {184238/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20174/1/2017Floor Amendment {353423/1 (Senator Miller) Adopted (46-0)61
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (139-0)66
Passed Enrolled66
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 11, 2017 2:00 P.M.