HB0880 (CH0525)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morales

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20172/6/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {916087/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/18/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)49
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {724638/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (136-0)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:03 P.M.