HB0895 (CH0235)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program - Membership, Duties, and Extension

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20163/19/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/19/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments {745365/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/21/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (134-0)50
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20163/30/2016Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/6/20163/31/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)60
House4/7/20163/31/2016Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.