HB0910

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 116-15

Sponsored by:

Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation

Status:

In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/13/20152/13/2015First Reading Environment and Transportation
3/23/20153/23/2015Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/23/20153/21/2015Favorable with Amendments {190916/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/24/20153/22/2015Third Reading Passed (137-0)52
Senate3/25/20153/22/2015First Reading Finance49
3/26/20153/26/2015Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11/20154/11/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/11/20154/4/2015Favorable with Amendments {287872/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/13/20154/5/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)63
House4/13/20154/8/2015House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments69
House Requests Senate Recede69
Conference Committee Appointed69
Delegates Healey, S. Robinson, and Cassilly69
Senate4/13/20154/7/2015Senate Refuses to Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Senators Feldman, Kelley, and Reilly65

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:44 P.M.